# Mathematics Tricks – Part 4

Reading Time: 5 minutes

This is the continuation of my previous post on Mathematics Tricks – Part 3

## Dividing any number by 5

Here I am going to show you the simple trick on how to divide any number using 5

Example 1:

24622 / 5 = 4924.4

Step 1: Multiply the number by 2 here multiply 24622 x 2 so the answer is 49244

Step 2: Now divide it by 10 or just move one decimal to the left so it would be become like 4924.4 and that’s the answer

Example 2:

58200 / 5 = 11640

Step 1: Multiply the number by 2 here multiply 58200 x 2 so the answer is 116400

Step 2: Now divide it by 10 or just move one decimal to the left so it would be become like 11640.0 and that’s the answer

## Multiplying any number by 25

To quickly multiply any number by 25 follow the below steps

Example 1:

44 x 25 = 1100

Step 1: Divide the number by 4. Here 44/4 is 11

Step 2: Now multiply by 100. Here 11 x 100 = 1100 so is the answer

Here the concept is number 25 is equal to 100/4 and if you notice here I am dividing the 44 by 4 & multiplying it by 100

Example 2:

46 x 25 = 1150

Step 1: Divide the number by 4. Here 46/4 will yield to 11 as quotient & 2 is reminder

Step 2: Now multiply by quotient by 100. Here 11 x 100 = 1100 & multiply reminder with 25 so 2 x 25 is 50 now add 1100 and 50 so is the answer 1150

## Square any two digit number

To quickly find the square of any two digit number follow the below steps

Example 1:

34 x 34 = 1156

Step 1: Here we have a special formula for it. i.e. A x A | 2AB | B x B

So here split the number 34 to A as 3 & B to 4

3 x 3 | 2 x 3 x 4  | 4 x 4

9        |      24       | 16

9        |    24 + 1   | 6

9        |      25       | 6

9 + 2 |      5         | 6

11       |      5         | 6

So the answer is 1156